TX SB949 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-19 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a limitation on the amount of attorney's fees awarded in a case assigned to a special three-judge district court.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a limitation on the amount of attorney's fees awarded in a case assigned to a special three-judge district court.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-19HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-19HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-18HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-18HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-15HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2017-05-15HouseRead first time
2017-04-25HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-24SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-24SenateRecord vote
2017-04-24SenatePassed
2017-04-24SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-24SenateRecord vote
2017-04-24SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-20SenateRecord vote
2017-04-20SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-04-20SenateRecord vote
2017-04-20SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-20SenateCo-author authorized
2017-04-19SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-10SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-10SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-04-10SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-06SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-04-06SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-06SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-01SenateReferred to State Affairs
2017-03-01SenateRead first time
2017-02-17SenateFiled
2017-02-17SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback