TX SB946 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-16 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-16 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to deadlines for performing various functions in connection with the ad valorem tax system.
Title
Relating to deadlines for performing various functions in connection with the ad valorem tax system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-16 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Filed |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appeal of Tax Decisions
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Taxation--Property-Appeal of Tax Decisions
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions