TX SB936 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-19 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-19 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of a joint interim committee to undertake a study of the public retirement systems of this state.
Title
Relating to the creation of a joint interim committee to undertake a study of the public retirement systems of this state.
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Huffman [R] | Sen. Paul Bettencourt [R] | Sen. Dawn Buckingham [R] | Sen. Charles Schwertner [R] |
Rep. Dan Flynn [R] | Rep. Dennis Paul [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-05-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-15 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2017-05-12 | House | Referred to Pensions |
2017-05-12 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-04 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Filed |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Interim Studies
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--County & District
Retirement Systems--General
Retirement Systems--Judicial
Retirement Systems--Municipal
Retirement Systems--Police & Firefighters
Retirement Systems--State Employees
Retirement Systems--Teachers
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--County & District
Retirement Systems--General
Retirement Systems--Judicial
Retirement Systems--Municipal
Retirement Systems--Police & Firefighters
Retirement Systems--State Employees
Retirement Systems--Teachers
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE