TX SB935 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-23 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-23 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to an exception to the titling requirement for certain motor vehicles; creating a criminal offense.
Title
Relating to an exception to the titling requirement for certain motor vehicles; creating a criminal offense.
Sponsors
Sen. Royce West [D] | Rep. John Kuempel [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-23 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-21 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-18 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-05-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-05-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-05-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-05-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-21 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2021-04-21 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-20 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2940 (Same As) 2021-03-18 - Referred to Transportation
Subjects
SALVAGE YARDS & SALVAGE DEALERS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration