TX SB927 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to exhibits presented at the Alamo complex.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to exhibits presented at the Alamo complex.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2019-05-07SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-03SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-03SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-02SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-11SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-11SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-11SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-10SenateMeeting cancelled
2019-04-10SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-01SenateReferred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
2019-03-01SenateRead first time
2019-02-20SenateFiled
2019-02-20SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback