TX SB916 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Conf. Comm. Report distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to supportive palliative care.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to supportive palliative care.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1508 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - Constitutional three day rule suspended RV#1507 (Y: 142 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2019-05-25SenateConference committee report filed
2019-05-23SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2019-05-23SenateHouse grants request for conf comm-reported
2019-05-23HouseHouse appoints conferees
2019-05-23HouseHouse grants request for conference committee
2019-05-23HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2019-05-23HouseSenate requests conference committee-reported
2019-05-23HouseSenate refuses to concur-reported
2019-05-23SenateSenate appoints conferees
2019-05-23SenateSenate requests conference committee
2019-05-23SenateSenate refuses to concur
2019-05-23SenateRead
2019-05-23SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2019-05-19SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2019-05-17HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-17HouseRecord vote RV#1508
2019-05-17HousePassed
2019-05-17HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-17HouseRecord vote RV#1507
2019-05-17HouseConstitutional three day rule suspended
2019-05-17HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2019-05-17HouseAmended 1-Oliverson
2019-05-17HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-17HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-15HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-13HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-10HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-10HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-09HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-09HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-06HouseReferred to Public Health
2019-05-06HouseRead first time
2019-04-30HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-30SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-30SenateRecord vote
2019-04-30SenatePassed
2019-04-30SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-30SenateRecord vote
2019-04-30SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-30SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-30SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-04-30SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-30SenateAmended
2019-04-30SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Johnson
2019-04-30SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-30SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-30SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-24SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-23SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-23SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-23SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-10SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-10SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-10SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-10SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-01SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2019-03-01SenateRead first time
2019-02-20SenateFiled
2019-02-20SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB2057 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Committee report sent to Calendars

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback