TX SB912 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-25 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to increasing the criminal penalty for certain conduct engaged in while participating in a riot and to restitution for property damage resulting from participating in a riot.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to increasing the criminal penalty for certain conduct engaged in while participating in a riot and to restitution for property damage resulting from participating in a riot.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-25HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-23HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-13HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-12HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-12HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-05HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-05HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-05-05HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-05HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-30HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2021-04-30HouseRead first time
2021-04-28HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-27SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-27SenateRecord vote
2021-04-27SenatePassed
2021-04-27SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-27SenateRecord vote
2021-04-27SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-27SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-27SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-04-27SenateRecord vote
2021-04-27SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2021-04-27SenateAmendment(s) offered FA2 Eckhardt
2021-04-27SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-27SenateAmended
2021-04-27SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Menéndez
2021-04-27SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-27SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-27SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-22SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-22SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-21SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-20SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-20SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-04-19SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-19SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-11SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-03-11SenateRead first time
2021-03-02SenateFiled
2021-03-02SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3652 (Same As) 2021-03-22 - Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB912
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00912I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00912S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00912E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00912H.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00912S2F1.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00912S2F2.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00912I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00912I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00912E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00912H.htm
Roll Callhttps://journals.senate.texas.gov/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ-04-27-F.PDF#page=17
Roll Callhttps://journals.senate.texas.gov/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ-04-27-F.PDF#page=18
Roll Callhttps://journals.senate.texas.gov/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-27-F.PDF#page=17
Roll Callhttps://journals.senate.texas.gov/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-27-F.PDF#page=18

Bill Comments

feedback