TX SB910 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a study of options for implementing family preservation services, the provision of certain other health and human services by certain state agency contractors, and the repeal of a prior pilot program for family-based safety services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a study of options for implementing family preservation services, the provision of certain other health and human services by certain state agency contractors, and the repeal of a prior pilot program for family-based safety services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-29 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1500 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-16 Effective immediately
2021-06-16 Signed by the Governor
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-31SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-29HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-29SenateRecord vote
2021-05-29SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2021-05-29SenateRead
2021-05-29SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2021-05-27SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2021-05-26HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26HouseRecord vote RV#1500
2021-05-26HousePassed
2021-05-26HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-26HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-26HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-26HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-05-23HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-05-18HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-05-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-17HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-13HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-13HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-05-13HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-05-13HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-05-11HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-05-11HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-05-11HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-05-11HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-11HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-30HouseReferred to Human Services
2021-04-30HouseRead first time
2021-04-23HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-23SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-23SenateRecord vote
2021-04-23SenatePassed
2021-04-23SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-23SenateRecord vote
2021-04-23SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-23SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-23SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-23SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-04-23SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-19SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-19SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-19SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-07SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-04-07SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-07SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-07SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-11SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2021-03-11SenateRead first time
2021-03-02SenateFiled
2021-03-02SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB910
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00910I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00910S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00910E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00910H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00910F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00910I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00910I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00910S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00910S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00910E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00910H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00910H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00910F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ-04-23-F.PDF#page=2
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB910&RcdVtNo=1500&Ch=H&Dt=05/26/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-29-F.PDF#page=81
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-23-F.PDF#page=2

Bill Comments

feedback