TX SB907 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the application for and issuance of a marriage license through the use of remote technology.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the application for and issuance of a marriage license through the use of remote technology.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-25 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1485 (Y: 136 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-16 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-16 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-27 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-27HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-25SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-25SenateHouse passage reported
2021-05-25HouseRecord vote RV#1485
2021-05-25HousePassed
2021-05-25HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-24HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-24HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-24HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-20HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-08HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-07HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-07HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-29HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-29HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-29HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2021-04-28HouseReferred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
2021-04-28HouseRead first time
2021-04-20HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-19SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-19SenateRecord vote
2021-04-19SenatePassed
2021-04-19SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-19SenateRecord vote
2021-04-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-19SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-04-19SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-09SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-09SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-09SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-04-06SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-06SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-11SenateReferred to Jurisprudence
2021-03-11SenateRead first time
2021-03-01SenateFiled
2021-03-01SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB907
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00907I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00907S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00907E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00907H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00907F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00907I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00907I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00907H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00907F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-19-F1.PDF#page=6
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB907&RcdVtNo=1485&Ch=H&Dt=05/25/2021

Bill Comments

feedback