TX SB907 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-05 - Referred to Human Services
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-05 - Referred to Human Services
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the definition of the least restrictive environment for the placement of children in foster care.
Title
Relating to the definition of the least restrictive environment for the placement of children in foster care.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Birdwell [R] | Sen. Bryan Hughes [R] | Sen. Lois Kolkhorst [R] | Sen. Charles Perry [R] |
Sen. Kel Seliger [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Passed (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Passed (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2017-05-05 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-25 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Amended |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Amended |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Filed |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |