TX SB900 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-15 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-15 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to penalties for certain family violence offenses and for assultive offenses against certain persons; imposing court costs.
Title
Relating to penalties for certain family violence offenses and for assultive offenses against certain persons; imposing court costs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-15 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-05-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-09 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2017-05-09 | House | Read first time |
2017-05-03 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Filed |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Corrections
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
Family
Family--Family Violence
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
Family
Family--Family Violence
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION