TX SB9 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 26 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-08-14 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the constitutional limit on the rate of growth of appropriations and appropriations of constitutionally dedicated revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the constitutional limit on the rate of growth of appropriations and appropriations of constitutionally dedicated revenue.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-25 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-25 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-14HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-08-14HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-08-13HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-08-12HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-08-12HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-08-12HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-08-12HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2017-08-02HouseReferred to Appropriations
2017-08-02HouseRead first time
2017-07-27HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-07-26SenateReported engrossed
2017-07-26SenateRecord vote
2017-07-26SenatePassed
2017-07-26SenateRead 3rd time
2017-07-26SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-07-25SenateRecord vote
2017-07-25SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-07-25SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-07-25SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-07-24SenateCo-author authorized
2017-07-23SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-07-23SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-07-22SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-07-22SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-07-22SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-07-20SenateReferred to Finance
2017-07-20SenateRead first time
2017-07-19SenateCo-author authorized
2017-07-17SenateFiled
2017-07-17SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback