TX SB898 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-07 - Co-author authorized
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-07 - Co-author authorized
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to charitable raffles conducted by certain professional sports team charitable foundations; providing penalties.
Title
Relating to charitable raffles conducted by certain professional sports team charitable foundations; providing penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-07 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Filed |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
SJR39 (Enabling for) 2015-04-07 - Co-author authorized
Subjects
Amusements, Games, Sports
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Charitable & Nonprofit Organizations
Courts
Courts--County & Statutory
Courts--District
Courts--Prosecuting Attorneys
PROFESSIONAL SPORTS TEAM CHARITABLE FOUNDATION RAFFLE ENABLING ACT
RAFFLES
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Charitable & Nonprofit Organizations
Courts
Courts--County & Statutory
Courts--District
Courts--Prosecuting Attorneys
PROFESSIONAL SPORTS TEAM CHARITABLE FOUNDATION RAFFLE ENABLING ACT
RAFFLES