TX SB891 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-13 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-13 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain investments in certain Texas businesses by insurance companies and related organizations.
Title
Relating to certain investments in certain Texas businesses by insurance companies and related organizations.
Sponsors
Sen. John Carona [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-13 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-11 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-10 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-10 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-05 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-06 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-06 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-04-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-06 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-23 | Referred to Economic Development | |
2011-03-23 | Read first time | |
2011-02-23 | Filed | |
2011-02-23 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Insurance
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
Insurance--General
Business & Commerce--General
Insurance
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
Insurance--General