TX SB89 | 2021 | 87th Legislature 2nd Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on August 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-08-31 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to making supplemental appropriations relating to border security and giving direction regarding those appropriations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to making supplemental appropriations relating to border security and giving direction regarding those appropriations.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-31SenateCo-author authorized
2021-08-30SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-08-30SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-08-30SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-08-30SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-08-27SenateReferred to Finance
2021-08-27SenateRead first time
2021-08-27SenateFiled
2021-08-27SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB9 (Same As) 2021-09-17 - Effective immediately
HB9 (Same As) 2021-09-17 - Effective immediately

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback