TX SB885 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-11 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-11 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the maximum number of semester credit hours allowed for and funding sources used to supplement a TEXAS grant and to the removal of obsolete references related to the Teach for Texas grant program.
Title
Relating to the maximum number of semester credit hours allowed for and funding sources used to supplement a TEXAS grant and to the removal of obsolete references related to the Teach for Texas grant program.
Sponsors
Sen. Kel Seliger [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | Senate | Removed from local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Filed |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--Student Financial Aid
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--Student Financial Aid
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS