TX SB884 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-17 - Referred to County Affairs
Pending: House County Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-17 - Referred to County Affairs
Pending: House County Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of certain counties to use county revenue or incur debt to improve or redevelop certain sports facilities.
Title
Relating to the authority of certain counties to use county revenue or incur debt to improve or redevelop certain sports facilities.
Sponsors
Sen. John Whitmire [D] | Sen. Paul Bettencourt [R] | Sen. Charles Creighton [R] | Sen. Sylvia Garcia [D] |
Sen. Lois Kolkhorst [R] | Sen. Eddie Lucio [D] | Sen. Borris Miles [D] | Sen. Larry Taylor [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2017-05-17 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-30 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Passed |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Filed |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Amusements, Games, Sports
County Government
County Government--Finance
County Government--General
RECREATIONAL & CULTURAL FACILITIES
County Government
County Government--Finance
County Government--General
RECREATIONAL & CULTURAL FACILITIES