TX SB881 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Pending: Senate Natural Resources & Economic Development Committee
Hearing: Apr 15 @ 9:00 am in Senate Chamber
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the jurisdiction and management of the Star of the Republic Museum by the Texas Historical Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the jurisdiction and management of the Star of the Republic Museum by the Texas Historical Commission.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-11SenateReferred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
2021-03-11SenateRead first time
2021-03-02SenateFiled
2021-03-02SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB892 (Same As) 2021-03-09 - Left pending in committee
HB2660 (Same As) 2021-04-16 - Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback