TX SB88 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on November 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-14 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-14 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to an annual adjustment to the basic allotment under the Foundation School Program to reflect inflation.
Title
Relating to an annual adjustment to the basic allotment under the Foundation School Program to reflect inflation.
Sponsors
Sen. Nathan Johnson [D] | Sen. Carol Alvarado [D] | Sen. Cesar Blanco [D] | Sen. Sarah Eckhardt [D] |
Sen. Borris Miles [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-14 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2022-11-14 | Senate | Filed |
2022-11-14 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB882 (Same As) 2023-03-01 - Referred to Public Education
HB882 (Same As) 2023-03-01 - Referred to Public Education
HB882 (Same As) 2023-03-01 - Referred to Public Education
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
FOUNDATION SCHOOL PROGRAM
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
FOUNDATION SCHOOL PROGRAM
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=SB88 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/SB00088I.htm |