TX SB876 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the licensing of insurance agents and adjusters; providing a penalty.
Title
Relating to the licensing of insurance agents and adjusters; providing a penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-19 - House - SB 876Third Reading House (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-19 | Effective on 9/1/15 | |
2015-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-30 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-28 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Read |
2015-05-28 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2015-05-19 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2015-05-19 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-19 | House | Passed |
2015-05-19 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-18 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2015-05-18 | House | Amended |
2015-05-18 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2015-05-15 | House | Postponed |
2015-05-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-14 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion |
2015-05-12 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-11 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-05-11 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-29 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2015-04-29 | House | Read first time |
2015-04-10 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Passed |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Filed |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
CONTINUING EDUCATION
Insurance
INSURANCE ADJUSTERS
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
INSURANCE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Insurance--Insurers & Agents
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Insurance
INSURANCE ADJUSTERS
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
INSURANCE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Insurance--Insurers & Agents
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions