TX SB873 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
Summary
Relating to a requirement that certain appraisal districts provide for electronic filing of and electronic communications regarding a protest of appraised value by the owner of a residence homestead.
Title
Relating to a requirement that certain appraisal districts provide for electronic filing of and electronic communications regarding a protest of appraised value by the owner of a residence homestead.
Sponsors
Rep. Dwayne Bohac [R] | Sen. Chris Harris [R] | Sen. Glenn Hegar [R] | Rep. John Otto [R] |
Sen. Tommy Williams [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-29 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-28 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-26 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-26 | House passage reported | |
2009-05-26 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-26 | Record vote | |
2009-05-26 | Passed | |
2009-05-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-23 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-23 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-22 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-19 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-18 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-18 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-18 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-14 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-05-14 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-05-14 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-13 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-13 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-11 | Meeting cancelled | |
2009-05-11 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-06 | Meeting cancelled | |
2009-05-06 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-29 | Referred to Ways & Means | |
2009-04-29 | Read first time | |
2009-04-23 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-23 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-23 | Record vote | |
2009-04-23 | Passed | |
2009-04-23 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-23 | Record vote | |
2009-04-23 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-23 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-23 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-23 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-14 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-14 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-14 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-09 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-09 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-02 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-02 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-02 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-02 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-09 | Referred to Finance | |
2009-03-09 | Read first time | |
2009-02-17 | Filed | |
2009-02-17 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Electronic Information Systems
INTERNET
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appeal of Tax Decisions
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
INTERNET
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appeal of Tax Decisions
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts