TX SB869 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to authorizing a beneficiary designation that transfers a motor vehicle at the owner's death.
Title
Relating to authorizing a beneficiary designation that transfers a motor vehicle at the owner's death.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1635 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-09 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-06-09 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-24 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-23 | Senate | House passage reported |
2017-05-23 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-23 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-23 | House | Passed |
2017-05-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-22 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-22 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-20 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-03 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2017-05-03 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-20 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Filed |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Probate
Probate--Wills & Admin of Estates
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
Probate
Probate--Wills & Admin of Estates
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration