TX SB866 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to electronic benefits transfer cards used by or for recipients of benefits under certain assistance programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to electronic benefits transfer cards used by or for recipients of benefits under certain assistance programs.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-04SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2021-04-28SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-28SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-27SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-27SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-04-26SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-26SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-14SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-04-14SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-14SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-14SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-11SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2021-03-11SenateRead first time
2021-03-01SenateFiled
2021-03-01SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback