TX SB861 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-03 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to remote meetings under the open meetings law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to remote meetings under the open meetings law.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-03SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2021-04-14SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-09SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-09SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-07SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-06SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-04-06SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-06SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-06SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-11SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2021-03-11SenateRead first time
2021-02-26SenateFiled
2021-02-26SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3793 (Same As) 2021-03-22 - Referred to State Affairs

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback