TX SB86 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on November 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-15 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-15 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the use, possession, delivery, or manufacture of testing equipment that identifies the presence of fentanyl, alpha-methylfentanyl, or any other derivative or controlled substance analogue of fentanyl.
Title
Relating to the use, possession, delivery, or manufacture of testing equipment that identifies the presence of fentanyl, alpha-methylfentanyl, or any other derivative or controlled substance analogue of fentanyl.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2022-11-14 | Senate | Filed |
2022-11-14 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
SB234 (Same As) 2023-02-15 - Referred to Criminal Justice
SB234 (Same As) 2023-02-15 - Referred to Criminal Justice
HB362 (Similar To) 2023-04-12 - Referred to Criminal Justice
HB85 (Similar To) 2023-02-23 - Referred to Public Health
HB685 (Similar To) 2023-02-23 - Referred to Public Health
HB867 (Similar To) 2023-03-01 - Referred to Public Health
HB1584 (Similar To) 2023-03-03 - Referred to Public Health
SB234 (Same As) 2023-02-15 - Referred to Criminal Justice
HB362 (Similar To) 2023-04-12 - Referred to Criminal Justice
HB85 (Similar To) 2023-02-23 - Referred to Public Health
HB685 (Similar To) 2023-02-23 - Referred to Public Health
HB867 (Similar To) 2023-03-01 - Referred to Public Health
HB1584 (Similar To) 2023-03-03 - Referred to Public Health
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=SB86 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/SB00086I.htm |