TX SB86 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on November 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-25 - Co-author authorized
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-25 - Co-author authorized
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the elimination of smoking in certain workplaces and public places; providing penalties.
Title
Relating to the elimination of smoking in certain workplaces and public places; providing penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-25 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Read first time |
2012-11-12 | Senate | Filed |
2012-11-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Health
Health--General
Political Subdivisions
SMOKING
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Tobacco Products
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Health
Health--General
Political Subdivisions
SMOKING
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Tobacco Products
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=83R&Bill=SB86 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/83R/billtext/html/SB00086I.htm |