TX SB852 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the basic allotment and guaranteed yield under the public school finance system.
Title
Relating to the basic allotment and guaranteed yield under the public school finance system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB462 (Same As) 2019-03-19 - Left pending in committee
SJR40 (Enabling for) 2019-03-04 - Co-author authorized
SJR40 (Enabling for) 2019-03-04 - Co-author authorized
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Legislature
Taxation
Taxation--School District
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Legislature
Taxation
Taxation--School District
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB852 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00852I.htm |