TX SB852 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-18 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-18 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to availability of certain property and casualty insurance forms.
Title
Relating to availability of certain property and casualty insurance forms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-02 - House - SB 852Third Reading House (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-18 | Effective on 9/1/13 | |
2013-05-18 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-07 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-06 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-03 | Senate | House passage reported |
2013-05-02 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-02 | House | Passed |
2013-05-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-02 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2013-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-02 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2013-04-29 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2013-04-24 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-18 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-04-18 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-04-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-04-08 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2013-04-08 | House | Read first time |
2013-04-01 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Passed |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Filed |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |