TX SB851 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the composition of the cybersecurity council.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the composition of the cybersecurity council.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1288 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-07 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-07 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-24 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-24HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-22SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-20SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-20SenateHouse passage reported
2021-05-20HouseRecord vote RV#1288
2021-05-20HousePassed
2021-05-20HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-19HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-19HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-19HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-17HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-27HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-27HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-27HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-14HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-14HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-13HouseReferred to State Affairs
2021-04-13HouseRead first time
2021-04-09HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-08SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-08SenateRecord vote
2021-04-08SenatePassed
2021-04-08SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-08SenateRecord vote
2021-04-08SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-08SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-08SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-08SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-07SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-03-30SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-03-30SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-03-30SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-03-30SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-30SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-29SenateMeeting cancelled
2021-03-29SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-11SenateReferred to Finance
2021-03-11SenateRead first time
2021-02-26SenateFiled
2021-02-26SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB2065 (Same As) 2021-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB851
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00851I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00851S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00851E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00851H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00851F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00851I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00851I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00851H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00851F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-08-F.PDF#page=34
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB851&RcdVtNo=1288&Ch=H&Dt=05/20/2021

Bill Comments

feedback