TX SB85 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-08-04 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-08-04 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to reporting requirements by certain physicians and health care facilities for abortion complications; authorizing a civil penalty.
Title
Relating to reporting requirements by certain physicians and health care facilities for abortion complications; authorizing a civil penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-20 - Senate - Rules suspended (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-04 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-07-21 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-07-21 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-07-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-07-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-07-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-07-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-07-20 | Senate | Point of order overruled |
2017-07-20 | Senate | Point of order |
2017-07-20 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2017-07-20 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-07-19 | Senate | Filed |
2017-07-19 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Abortion
Electronic Information Systems
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health Care Providers
PHYSICIANS
Electronic Information Systems
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health Care Providers
PHYSICIANS