TX SB844 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-13 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to repeal of certain Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974 exemption provisions relating to pharmacy benefits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to repeal of certain Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974 exemption provisions relating to pharmacy benefits.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-04-13SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-13SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-11SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2021-03-11SenateRead first time
2021-03-09SenateCo-author authorized
2021-02-26SenateFiled
2021-02-26SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB2787 (Same As) 2021-04-28 - Received from the House

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback