TX SB843 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a sales tax exemption for items sold, leased, or rented at a United States military installation to a member of the United States armed forces on active duty.
Title
Relating to a sales tax exemption for items sold, leased, or rented at a United States military installation to a member of the United States armed forces on active duty.
Sponsors
Sen. Pat Fallon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Meeting cancelled |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB843 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00843I.htm |