TX SB836 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-29 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-29 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to management services for the physical facilities of the Texas School for the Blind and Visually Impaired and the Texas School for the Deaf.
Title
Relating to management services for the physical facilities of the Texas School for the Blind and Visually Impaired and the Texas School for the Deaf.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-29 | Effective immediately | |
2015-05-29 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-21 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-21 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-20 | Senate | House passage reported |
2015-05-20 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-20 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-20 | House | Passed |
2015-05-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-19 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-19 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-19 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-15 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-12 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-08 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-05-08 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-30 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2015-04-30 | House | Read first time |
2015-04-23 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Passed |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Filed |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
BLIND & VISUALLY IMPAIRED, TEXAS SCHOOL FOR THE
DEAF, TEXAS SCHOOL FOR THE
Disabilities, Persons with
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Facilities
FACILITIES COMMISSION, TEXAS
DEAF, TEXAS SCHOOL FOR THE
Disabilities, Persons with
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Facilities
FACILITIES COMMISSION, TEXAS