TX SB828 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-29 - Conf. Comm. Report distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-29 - Conf. Comm. Report distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the use of municipal hotel occupancy tax revenue in certain municipalities.
Title
Relating to the use of municipal hotel occupancy tax revenue in certain municipalities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-25 - House - Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal RV#1484 (Y: 96 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-29 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House grants request for conf comm-reported |
2021-05-28 | House | House appoints conferees |
2021-05-28 | House | House grants request for conference committee |
2021-05-28 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2021-05-28 | House | Senate requests conference committee-reported |
2021-05-28 | House | Senate refuses to concur-reported |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Senate requests conference committee |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Read |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2021-05-25 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2021-05-25 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-25 | House | Record vote RV#1484 |
2021-05-25 | House | Passed as amended |
2021-05-25 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-25 | House | Amended 2-E. Morales |
2021-05-25 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-25 | House | Amended 1-Toth |
2021-05-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-24 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-24 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2021-05-24 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-24 | House | Amended 5-Toth |
2021-05-24 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-24 | House | Amended 4-Clardy |
2021-05-24 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-24 | House | Amended 3-Wilson |
2021-05-24 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-24 | House | Amended 2-Zwiener |
2021-05-24 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-24 | House | Amended 1-Klick |
2021-05-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-24 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-20 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-13 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-05 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-05-05 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-05-03 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2021-05-03 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-29 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3343 (Same As) 2021-04-22 - Committee report sent to Calendars