TX SB827 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to health benefit plan cost-sharing requirements for prescription insulin.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to health benefit plan cost-sharing requirements for prescription insulin.

Sponsors

Sen. Lois Kolkhorst [R]Sen. Carol Alvarado [D]Sen. Paul Bettencourt [R]Sen. Cesar Blanco [D]
Sen. Donna Campbell [R]Sen. Sarah Eckhardt [D]Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D]Sen. Joan Huffman [R]
Sen. Bryan Hughes [R]Sen. Eddie Lucio [D]Sen. Jose Menendez [D]Sen. Borris Miles [D]
Sen. Angela Paxton [R]Sen. Royce West [D]Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D]Sen. Charles Creighton [R]
Sen. Roland Gutierrez [D]Rep. Eddie Lucio [D]Rep. James Talarico [D]Rep. Rafael Anchia [D]
Rep. Charles Anderson [R]Rep. Trent Ashby [R]Rep. Ernest Bailes [R]Rep. Michelle Beckley [D]
Rep. Cecil Bell [R]Rep. Diego Bernal [D]Rep. Brad Buckley [R]Rep. John Bucy [D]
Rep. Dewayne Burns [R]Rep. Elizabeth Campos [D]Rep. Terry Canales [D]Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]
Rep. Sheryl Cole [D]Rep. Nicole Collier [D]Rep. David Cook [R]Rep. Philip Cortez [D]
Rep. Jasmine Crockett [D]Rep. John Cyrier [R]Rep. Drew Darby [R]Rep. Yvonne Davis [D]
Rep. Joe Deshotel [D]Rep. Alex Dominguez [D]Rep. Art Fierro [D]Rep. James Frank [R]
Rep. Charlie Geren [R]Rep. Barbara Gervin-Hawkins [D]Rep. Jessica Gonzalez [D]Rep. Mary Gonzalez [D]
Rep. Vikki Goodwin [D]Rep. Robert Guerra [D]Rep. Ryan Guillen [D]Rep. Sam Harless [R]
Rep. Cody Harris [R]Rep. Ana Hernandez [D]Rep. Abel Herrero [D]Rep. Gina Hinojosa [D]
Rep. Justin Holland [R]Rep. Donna Howard [D]Rep. Todd Hunter [R]Rep. Celia Israel [D]
Rep. Ann Johnson [D]Rep. Jarvis Johnson [D]Rep. Kyle Kacal [R]Rep. Ken King [R]
Rep. Phil King [R]Rep. Tracy King [D]Rep. Stephanie Klick [R]Rep. Matt Krause [R]
Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R]Rep. Lyle Larson [R]Rep. Jeff Leach [R]Rep. Ben Leman [R]
Rep. Oscar Longoria [D]Rep. Ray Lopez [D]Rep. J.M. Lozano [R]Rep. Trey Martinez Fischer [D]
Rep. Morgan Meyer [R]Rep. Ina Minjarez [D]Rep. Eddie Morales [D]Rep. Geanie Morrison [R]
Rep. Sergio Munoz [D]Rep. Tom Oliverson [R]Rep. Claudia Ordaz Perez [D]Rep. Lina Ortega [D]
Rep. Leo Pacheco [D]Rep. Chris Paddie [R]Rep. Tan Parker [R]Rep. Jared Patterson [R]
Rep. Mary Perez [D]Rep. Four Price [R]Rep. Ana-Maria Ramos [D]Rep. Richard Raymond [D]
Rep. Ron Reynolds [D]Rep. Eddie Rodriguez [D]Rep. Glenn Rogers [R]Rep. Ramon Romero [D]
Rep. Toni Rose [D]Rep. Jon Rosenthal [D]Rep. Carl Sherman [D]Rep. Hugh Shine [R]
Rep. Reggie Smith [R]Rep. John Smithee [R]Rep. Lynn Stucky [R]Rep. Shawn Thierry [D]
Rep. Ed Thompson [R]Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D]Rep. Chris Turner [D]Rep. John Turner [D]
Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R]Rep. Hubert Vo [D]Rep. Eugene Wu [D]Rep. Erin Zwiener [D]

Roll Calls

2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1376 (Y: 140 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-14 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-28SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-27HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-27SenateRecord vote
2021-05-27SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2021-05-27SenateRead
2021-05-27SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2021-05-24SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2021-05-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-24HouseRecord vote RV#1376
2021-05-24HousePassed
2021-05-24HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-23HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-23HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-23HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-22HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-20HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-11HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-11HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-11HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-27HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-27HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-20HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-20HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-20HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-20HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-20HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-06HouseReferred to Insurance
2021-04-06HouseRead first time
2021-03-29HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-03-25SenateReported engrossed
2021-03-25SenateRecord vote
2021-03-25SenatePassed
2021-03-25SenateRead 3rd time
2021-03-25SenateRecord vote
2021-03-25SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-03-25SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-03-25SenatePassed to engrossment
2021-03-25SenateAmendment withdrawn
2021-03-25SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Perry
2021-03-25SenateRead 2nd time
2021-03-25SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-03-23SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-03-23SenateCo-author authorized
2021-03-22SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-03-22SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-17SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-03-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-17SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-11SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2021-03-11SenateRead first time
2021-03-09SenateCo-author authorized
2021-02-26SenateFiled
2021-02-26SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB82 (Same As) 2021-02-25 - Referred to Insurance

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB827
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00827I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00827S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00827E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00827H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00827F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00827S2F1.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00827I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00827I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00827S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00827S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00827E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00827H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00827H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00827F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ03-25-F.PDF#page=5
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB827&RcdVtNo=1376&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-27-F.PDF#page=102

Bill Comments

feedback