TX SB824 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-21 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to compensation of certain justices and judges for performing extrajudicial services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to compensation of certain justices and judges for performing extrajudicial services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-21HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-20HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-20HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-19HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-19HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-19HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-16HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2017-05-16HouseRead first time
2017-05-11HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-05-11SenateReported engrossed
2017-05-11SenateRecord vote
2017-05-11SenatePassed
2017-05-11SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-11SenateRecord vote
2017-05-11SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-11SenateRecord vote
2017-05-11SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-05-11SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-11SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-10SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-09SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-09SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-08SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-05-08SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-08SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-27SenateReferred to State Affairs
2017-02-27SenateRead first time
2017-02-10SenateFiled
2017-02-10SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback