TX SB819 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-22 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-22 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Summary
Relating to the vaccination against bacterial meningitis of certain first-time students at public and private or independent institutions of higher education.
Title
Relating to the vaccination against bacterial meningitis of certain first-time students at public and private or independent institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
Sen. Wendy Davis [D] | Rep. Donna Howard [D] | Sen. Eddie Lucio [D] | Sen. Jane Nelson [R] |
Sen. Leticia Van De Putte [D] | Sen. Royce West [D] | Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-22 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-22 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-22 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-19 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-05-19 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-19 | Meeting cancelled | |
2009-05-19 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | |
2009-05-13 | Meeting cancelled | |
2009-05-13 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-29 | Referred to Higher Education | |
2009-04-29 | Read first time | |
2009-04-27 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-24 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-24 | Record vote | |
2009-04-24 | Passed | |
2009-04-24 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-24 | Record vote | |
2009-04-24 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-24 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-24 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2009-04-24 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-24 | Amended | |
2009-04-24 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-04-24 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-24 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-04-23 | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-20 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-20 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-15 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-15 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-15 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-16 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-03-09 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-03-04 | Referred to Higher Education | |
2009-03-04 | Read first time | |
2009-03-04 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-02-24 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-02-12 | Filed | |
2009-02-12 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
IMMUNIZATIONS
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
IMMUNIZATIONS