TX SB815 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Vetoed on June 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-15 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the creation and preservation of certain records of criminal proceedings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the creation and preservation of certain records of criminal proceedings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-26 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-26 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1976 (Y: 102 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Amended RV#1595 (Y: 81 N: 52 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Failed to pass RV#1561 (Y: 71 N: 71 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-15 Vetoed by the Governor
2019-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-27HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-27SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-26SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2019-05-26HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-26HouseRecord vote RV#1976
2019-05-26HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2019-05-26HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2019-05-26SenateRecord vote
2019-05-26SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2019-05-25HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2019-05-25SenateConference committee report filed
2019-05-23SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2019-05-23SenateHouse grants request for conf comm-reported
2019-05-23HouseHouse appoints conferees
2019-05-23HouseHouse grants request for conference committee
2019-05-23HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2019-05-23HouseSenate requests conference committee-reported
2019-05-23HouseSenate refuses to concur-reported
2019-05-23SenateSenate appoints conferees
2019-05-23SenateSenate requests conference committee
2019-05-23SenateSenate refuses to concur
2019-05-23SenateRead
2019-05-23SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2019-05-22SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2019-05-21HouseReason for vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-21HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-21HouseRecord vote RV#1595
2019-05-21HousePassed as amended
2019-05-21HouseAmended 2-Moody
2019-05-21HouseAmendment withdrawn 1-Moody
2019-05-21HouseVote reconsidered
2019-05-21HouseVote reconsidered
2019-05-21House1 hr. notice-for reconsideration
2019-05-21HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-21HouseRecord vote RV#1561
2019-05-21HouseFailed to pass
2019-05-21HouseAmended 1-Moody
2019-05-21HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-20HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2019-05-20HouseAmended 1-Moody
2019-05-20HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-20HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-17HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-16HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-15HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-15HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-14HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-14HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-09HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2019-05-09HouseRead first time
2019-05-07HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-05-07SenateReported engrossed
2019-05-07SenateRecord vote
2019-05-07SenatePassed
2019-05-07SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-07SenateRecord vote
2019-05-07SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-07SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-07SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-05-07SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-03SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-01SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-01SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-01SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-01SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-01SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-01SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2019-03-01SenateRead first time
2019-02-13SenateFiled
2019-02-13SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB4474 (Same As) 2019-03-26 - Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB815
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00815I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00815S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00815E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00815H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00815F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-07-F1.PDF#page=15
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-07-F1.PDF#page=16
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB815&RcdVtNo=1561&Ch=H&Dt=05/21/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB815&RcdVtNo=1595&Ch=H&Dt=05/21/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB815&RcdVtNo=1976&Ch=H&Dt=05/26/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-26-F.PDF#page=37

Bill Comments

feedback