TX SB813 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the insurance premium tax credit for the certified rehabilitation of certified historic structures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the insurance premium tax credit for the certified rehabilitation of certified historic structures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-08 - House - Read 3rd time RV#898 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-24 Vetoed by the Governor
2021-05-12 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-12HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-12SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-10SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-10SenateHouse passage reported
2021-05-08HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-08HouseRecord vote RV#898
2021-05-08HousePassed
2021-05-08HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-08HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-08HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-08HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-08HouseLaid out in lieu of companion HB 4326
2021-04-22HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-22HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-22HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-16HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-16HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-14HouseReferred to Insurance
2021-04-14HouseRead first time
2021-04-12HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-09SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-09SenateRecord vote
2021-04-09SenatePassed
2021-04-09SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-09SenateRecord vote
2021-04-09SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-09SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-09SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-09SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-04-09SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-03-30SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-03-30SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-03-30SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-03-30SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-03-30SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-30SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-29SenateMeeting cancelled
2021-03-29SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-11SenateReferred to Finance
2021-03-11SenateRead first time
2021-02-25SenateFiled
2021-02-25SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB4326 (Same As) 2021-05-08 - Laid on the table subject to call

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB813
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00813I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00813S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00813E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00813H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00813F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00813I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00813I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00813H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00813F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-09-F.PDF#page=4
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB813&RcdVtNo=898&Ch=H&Dt=05/08/2021

Bill Comments

feedback