TX SB812 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the application of the limit on appraised value of a residence homestead for ad valorem tax purposes to an improvement that is a replacement structure for a structure that was rendered uninhabitable or unusable by a casualty or by wind or water damage.
Title
Relating to the application of the limit on appraised value of a residence homestead for ad valorem tax purposes to an improvement that is a replacement structure for a structure that was rendered uninhabitable or unusable by a casualty or by wind or water damage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#766 (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Effective immediately | |
2019-05-07 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-04-30 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-04-29 | Senate | House passage reported |
2019-04-26 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-26 | House | Record vote RV#766 |
2019-04-26 | House | Passed |
2019-04-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-25 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2019-04-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-25 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion HB 1842 |
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-08 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2019-04-08 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-05 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Property Tax |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1842 (Same As) 2019-04-25 - Laid on the table subject to call
Subjects
Coastal Affairs & Beaches
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
GENERAL LAND OFFICE
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Property Interests--Real Property
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
GENERAL LAND OFFICE
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Property Interests--Real Property
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions