TX SB802 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-02 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-02 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Summary
Relating to the requirements for a plumber's apprentice to obtain a plumber's license.
Title
Relating to the requirements for a plumber's apprentice to obtain a plumber's license.
Sponsors
Sen. John Carona [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-02 | Removed from local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-03-20 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-03-20 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-03-20 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-03-18 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-18 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-17 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-17 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-03-17 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-17 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-04 | Referred to Business & Commerce | |
2009-03-04 | Read first time | |
2009-02-11 | Filed | |
2009-02-11 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1758 (Same As) 2009-05-27 - Effective on 9/1/09
Subjects
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PLUMBERS & PLUMBING
PLUMBING EXAMINERS, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PLUMBERS & PLUMBING
PLUMBING EXAMINERS, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF