TX SB8 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 90-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to abortion, including abortions after detection of an unborn child's heartbeat; authorizing a private civil right of action.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to abortion, including abortions after detection of an unborn child's heartbeat; authorizing a private civil right of action.

Sponsors

Sen. Bryan Hughes [R]Sen. Paul Bettencourt [R]Sen. Brian Birdwell [R]Sen. Dawn Buckingham [R]
Sen. Donna Campbell [R]Sen. Charles Creighton [R]Sen. Bob Hall [R]Sen. Kelly Hancock [R]
Sen. Joan Huffman [R]Sen. Lois Kolkhorst [R]Sen. Eddie Lucio [D]Sen. Jane Nelson [R]
Sen. Angela Paxton [R]Sen. Charles Perry [R]Sen. Charles Schwertner [R]Sen. Drew Springer [R]
Sen. Larry Taylor [R]Rep. Shelby Slawson [R]Rep. Dustin Burrows [R]Rep. Stephanie Klick [R]
Rep. Briscoe Cain [R]Rep. Jeff Leach [R]Rep. Stephen Allison [R]Rep. Charles Anderson [R]
Rep. Trent Ashby [R]Rep. Ernest Bailes [R]Rep. Cecil Bell [R]Rep. Keith Bell [R]
Rep. Kyle Biedermann [R]Rep. Greg Bonnen [R]Rep. Brad Buckley [R]Rep. Dewayne Burns [R]
Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]Rep. Jeff Cason [R]Rep. Travis Clardy [R]Rep. David Cook [R]
Rep. John Cyrier [R]Rep. Drew Darby [R]Rep. Jay Dean [R]Rep. Jake Ellzey [R]
Rep. James Frank [R]Rep. John Frullo [R]Rep. Gary Gates [R]Rep. Craig Goldman [R]
Rep. Sam Harless [R]Rep. Cody Harris [R]Rep. Cole Hefner [R]Rep. Justin Holland [R]
Rep. Dan Huberty [R]Rep. Lacey Hull [R]Rep. Todd Hunter [R]Rep. Jacey Jetton [R]
Rep. Ken King [R]Rep. Phil King [R]Rep. Matt Krause [R]Rep. John Kuempel [R]
Rep. Stan Lambert [R]Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R]Rep. Ben Leman [R]Rep. J.M. Lozano [R]
Rep. William Metcalf [R]Rep. Mayes Middleton [R]Rep. Jim Murphy [R]Rep. Andrew Murr [R]
Rep. Candy Noble [R]Rep. Tom Oliverson [R]Rep. Chris Paddie [R]Rep. Tan Parker [R]
Rep. Jared Patterson [R]Rep. Dennis Paul [R]Rep. Four Price [R]Rep. John Raney [R]
Rep. Glenn Rogers [R]Rep. Scott Sanford [R]Rep. Matt Schaefer [R]Rep. Mike Schofield [R]
Rep. Matthew Shaheen [R]Rep. Hugh Shine [R]Rep. Bryan Slaton [R]Rep. Reggie Smith [R]
Rep. David Spiller [R]Rep. Phil Stephenson [R]Rep. Lynn Stucky [R]Rep. Valoree Swanson [R]
Rep. Ed Thompson [R]Rep. Tony Tinderholt [R]Rep. Steve Toth [R]Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R]
Rep. Cody Vasut [R]Rep. James White [R]Rep. Terry Wilson [R]

Roll Calls

2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#784 (Y: 83 N: 64 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - Amendment withdrawn RV#762 (Y: 81 N: 63 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - RV#761 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - RV#760 (Y: 136 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - FA1 Hughes (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-19 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-05-19 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-14 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-14HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-14SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-13SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-13HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-13SenateRecord vote
2021-05-13SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2021-05-13SenateRead
2021-05-13SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2021-05-10SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2021-05-06HouseRecord vote RV#784
2021-05-06HousePassed
2021-05-06HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-05HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-05HouseRecord vote RV#762
2021-05-05HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-05-05HouseAmendment withdrawn 3-Dutton
2021-05-05HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-05HouseRecord vote RV#761
2021-05-05HouseAmended 2-Slawson
2021-05-05HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-05HouseRecord vote RV#760
2021-05-05HouseAmended 1-Slawson
2021-05-05HouseLaid out as postponed business
2021-05-05HousePostponed
2021-05-05HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-05HousePlaced on Major State Calendar
2021-05-03HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-29HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-28HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-28HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-15HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-15HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-06HouseReferred to Public Health
2021-04-06HouseRead first time
2021-03-31HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-03-30SenateReported engrossed
2021-03-30SenateRemarks ordered printed
2021-03-30SenateRecord vote
2021-03-30SenatePassed
2021-03-30SenateRead 3rd time
2021-03-30SenateRecord vote
2021-03-30SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-03-29SenateRecord vote
2021-03-29SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-03-29SenateRecord vote
2021-03-29SenateAmended
2021-03-29SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Hughes
2021-03-29SenateRead 2nd time
2021-03-29SenateRecord vote
2021-03-29SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-03-23SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-03-22SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-03-22SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-15SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-03-15SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-03-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-11SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-03-11SenateRead first time
2021-03-11SenateFiled
2021-03-11SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1515 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars
HB1515 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB8
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00008I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00008S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00008E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00008H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00008F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00008S2F1.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00008H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00008H22.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00008H23.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00008I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00008I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00008S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00008S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00008E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00008H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00008F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00008F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ03-29-F.PDF#page=12
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ03-29-F.PDF#page=15
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ03-30-F.PDF#page=7
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB8&RcdVtNo=760&Ch=H&Dt=05/05/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB8&RcdVtNo=761&Ch=H&Dt=05/05/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB8&RcdVtNo=762&Ch=H&Dt=05/05/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB8&RcdVtNo=784&Ch=H&Dt=05/06/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-13-F.PDF#page=16

Bill Comments 750

feedback