TX SB794 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective on 1/1/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective on 1/1/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to eligibility for the exemption from ad valorem taxation of the residence homestead of a totally disabled veteran.
Title
Relating to eligibility for the exemption from ad valorem taxation of the residence homestead of a totally disabled veteran.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-30 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-30 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1758 (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1446 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-30 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1758 (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1446 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | Effective on 1/1/22 | |
2021-06-16 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-31 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-30 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2021-05-30 | House | Record vote RV#1758 |
2021-05-30 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2021-05-30 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2021-05-29 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House grants request for conf comm-reported |
2021-05-28 | House | House appoints conferees |
2021-05-28 | House | House grants request for conference committee |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate requests conference committee-reported |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate refuses to concur-reported |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Senate requests conference committee |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Read |
2021-05-27 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2021-05-25 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2021-05-25 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-25 | House | Record vote RV#1446 |
2021-05-25 | House | Passed |
2021-05-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-24 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2021-05-24 | House | Amended 1-Buckley |
2021-05-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-23 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-20 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-14 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-14 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-05 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-05-05 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-05-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-05-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-05-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-28 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2021-04-28 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-20 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Filed |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Disabilities, Persons with
Military & Veterans
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Military & Veterans
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions