TX SB791 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to education about congenital cytomegalovirus in infants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to education about congenital cytomegalovirus in infants.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-22 - House - SB 791Third Reading House (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-19 Effective on 9/1/15
2015-06-19 Signed by the Governor
2015-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2015-05-30HouseSigned in the House
2015-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2015-05-28SenateReported enrolled
2015-05-28HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2015-05-28SenateRecord vote
2015-05-28SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2015-05-28SenateRead
2015-05-28SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2015-05-24SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2015-05-22HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2015-05-22HouseRecord vote
2015-05-22HousePassed
2015-05-22HouseRead 3rd time
2015-05-22HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2015-05-22HousePassed to 3rd reading
2015-05-22HouseRead 2nd time
2015-05-22HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2015-05-21HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2015-05-21HouseRules suspended
2015-05-21HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2015-05-20HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-05-20HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-05-19HouseReported favorably as substituted
2015-05-19HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2015-05-19HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2015-05-19HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2015-05-19HouseLeft pending in committee
2015-05-19HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2015-05-19HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2015-05-19HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-05-19HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-04-30HouseReferred to Public Health
2015-04-30HouseRead first time
2015-04-08HouseReceived from the Senate
2015-04-07SenateReported engrossed
2015-04-07SenateRecord vote
2015-04-07SenatePassed
2015-04-07SenateRead 3rd time
2015-04-07SenateRecord vote
2015-04-07SenateThree day rule suspended
2015-04-07SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-04-07SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2015-04-07SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-04-07SenateAmended
2015-04-07SenateAmendment(s) offered
2015-04-07SenateRead 2nd time
2015-04-07SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2015-04-07SenateCo-author authorized
2015-03-31SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2015-03-30SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2015-03-30SenateReported favorably as substituted
2015-03-25SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-03-18SenateLeft pending in committee
2015-03-18SenateTestimony taken in committee
2015-03-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-03-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-03-02SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2015-03-02SenateRead first time
2015-02-25SenateFiled
2015-02-25SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback