TX SB788 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the development of model data-sharing agreements for sharing certain student information between public schools, public and private institutions of higher education, and other entities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the development of model data-sharing agreements for sharing certain student information between public schools, public and private institutions of higher education, and other entities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-08 - House - Read 3rd time RV#898 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-24 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-05-24 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-12 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-12HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-12SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-10SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-10SenateHouse passage reported
2021-05-08HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-08HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-08HouseRecord vote RV#898
2021-05-08HousePassed
2021-05-08HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-08HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-08HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-08HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-08HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-05-04HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-04-28HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-04-27HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-27HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-21HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-21HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-04-21HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-07HouseReferred to International Relations & Economic Development
2021-04-07HouseRead first time
2021-04-01HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-03-31SenateReported engrossed
2021-03-31SenateRecord vote
2021-03-31SenatePassed
2021-03-31SenateRead 3rd time
2021-03-31SenateRecord vote
2021-03-31SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-03-31SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-03-31SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-03-31SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-03-31SenateCo-author authorized
2021-03-30SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-03-30SenateCo-author authorized
2021-03-29SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-03-29SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-03-29SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-24SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-03-24SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-24SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-11SenateReferred to Higher Education
2021-03-11SenateRead first time
2021-02-24SenateFiled
2021-02-24SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB4096 (Similar To) 2021-05-11 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
HB4096 (Similar To) 2021-05-11 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB788
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00788I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00788S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00788E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00788H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00788F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00788I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00788I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00788S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00788S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00788H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00788F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ03-31-F.PDF#page=12
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB788&RcdVtNo=898&Ch=H&Dt=05/08/2021

Bill Comments

feedback