TX SB787 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a reduced occupational licensing fee for certain former license holders.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a reduced occupational licensing fee for certain former license holders.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-01HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-01HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-30HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-30HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-26HouseReferred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
2019-04-26HouseRead first time
2019-04-23HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-23SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-23SenateRecord vote
2019-04-23SenatePassed
2019-04-23SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-23SenateRecord vote
2019-04-23SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-23SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-23SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-04-23SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-23SenateAmended
2019-04-23SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Hancock
2019-04-23SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-23SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-17SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-08SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-08SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-08SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-02SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-26SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-03-26SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-26SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-01SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2019-03-01SenateRead first time
2019-02-12SenateFiled
2019-02-12SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3624 (Same As) 2019-04-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback