TX SB778 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-30 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-30 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the review by local governmental entities of certain sales and use tax audit reports and audit working papers.
Title
Relating to the review by local governmental entities of certain sales and use tax audit reports and audit working papers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Meeting cancelled |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Filed |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4032 (Same As) 2021-04-12 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
AUDITS & AUDITORS
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Taxation
Taxation--City
Taxation--County
Taxation--Sales
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Taxation
Taxation--City
Taxation--County
Taxation--Sales