TX SB776 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the creation of an inclusive sports program by the University Interscholastic League to provide students with intellectual disabilities access to team sports.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the creation of an inclusive sports program by the University Interscholastic League to provide students with intellectual disabilities access to team sports.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1394 (Y: 143 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-14 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-26SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-24SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-24SenateHouse passage reported
2021-05-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-24HouseRecord vote RV#1394
2021-05-24HousePassed
2021-05-24HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-23HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-23HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-22HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-20HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-19HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-18HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-18HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-17HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-17HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-05-03HouseReferred to Public Education
2021-05-03HouseRead first time
2021-04-29HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-29SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-29SenateRecord vote
2021-04-29SenatePassed
2021-04-29SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-29SenateRecord vote
2021-04-29SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-29SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-29SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-29SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-04-29SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-29SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-28SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-26SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-23SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-23SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-23SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-20SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-15SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-04-15SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-11SenateReferred to Education
2021-03-11SenateRead first time
2021-02-24SenateFiled
2021-02-24SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB2193 (Same As) 2021-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB776
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00776I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00776S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00776E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00776H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00776F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00776I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00776I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00776S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00776S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00776H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00776F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-29-F.PDF#page=6
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB776&RcdVtNo=1394&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2021

Bill Comments 750

feedback