TX SB775 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-04 - Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
Pending: House Defense & Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-04 - Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
Pending: House Defense & Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to providing information to the public and to purchasers of real property regarding the impact of military installations.
Title
Relating to providing information to the public and to purchasers of real property regarding the impact of military installations.
Sponsors
Sen. Craig Estes [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs |
2017-05-04 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-20 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Filed |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Land Use & Zoning
County Government
County Government--Land Use & Zoning
Military & Veterans
Open Records
Political Subdivisions
Property Interests
Property Interests--Landlord & Tenant
Property Interests--Real Property
City Government--Land Use & Zoning
County Government
County Government--Land Use & Zoning
Military & Veterans
Open Records
Political Subdivisions
Property Interests
Property Interests--Landlord & Tenant
Property Interests--Real Property