TX SB770 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 10 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to eligibility for job-training programs provided under the self-sufficiency fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to eligibility for job-training programs provided under the self-sufficiency fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-07 - House - Read 3rd time RV#889 (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-12 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-12HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-12SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-10SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-10SenateHouse passage reported
2021-05-07HouseRecord vote RV#889
2021-05-07HousePassed
2021-05-07HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-06HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-06HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-06HouseLaid out in lieu of companion HB 1791
2021-05-04HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-04HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-04HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-03HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-03HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-05-03HouseReferred to International Relations & Economic Development
2021-05-03HouseRead first time
2021-04-29HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-29SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-29SenateRecord vote
2021-04-29SenatePassed
2021-04-29SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-29SenateRecord vote
2021-04-29SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-29SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-29SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-29SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-04-29SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-23SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-23SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-23SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-04-22SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-22SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-11SenateReferred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
2021-03-11SenateRead first time
2021-02-23SenateFiled
2021-02-23SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1791 (Same As) 2021-05-06 - Laid on the table subject to call

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB770
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00770I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00770S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00770E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00770H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00770F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00770I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00770I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00770H.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-29-F.PDF#page=6
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB770&RcdVtNo=889&Ch=H&Dt=05/07/2021

Bill Comments 750

feedback